|
05/18/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Public Act 10-42
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 471
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
File Number 560
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
House Calendar Number 349
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety
|
|
|