04/27/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2010 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/13/2010 | File Number 490 | |||
04/13/2010 | House Calendar Number 292 | |||
04/13/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/19/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations |