|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 558
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4755
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
File Number 149
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
House Calendar Number 103
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/24/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Program Review and Investigations
|
|
|