04/21/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/21/2010 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/20/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/14/2010 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
04/13/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/08/2010 | File Number 425 | |||
04/08/2010 | House Calendar Number 224 | |||
04/08/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/01/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/24/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |