04/07/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/01/2010 | File Number 278 | |||
04/01/2010 | House Calendar Number 153 | |||
04/01/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/01/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/19/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |