04/12/2010 | File Number 450 | |||
04/12/2010 | House Calendar Number 255 | |||
04/12/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/24/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/26/2010 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |