|
05/04/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 565
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5031
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
File Number 155
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
House Calendar Number 109
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/26/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/04
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Housing
|
|
|