|
06/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Public Act 10-184
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 559
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 4279
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5051
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/23/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
File Number 495
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
House Calendar Number 297
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/12
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|