04/27/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/27/2010 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/27/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/22/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/08/2010 | File Number 431 | |||
04/08/2010 | House Calendar Number 216 | |||
04/08/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/01/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/19/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/05/2010 | Public Hearing 03/12 | |||
03/03/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |