04/14/2010 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/14/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/14/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2010 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/07/2010 | File Number 373 | |||
04/07/2010 | House Calendar Number 206 | |||
04/07/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
03/30/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/19/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/04/2010 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
03/03/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |