|
06/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Public Act 10-175
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
File Number 664
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 490
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 3936
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
File Number 433
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
House Calendar Number 218
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
|
03/03/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|