04/15/2010 | File Number 564 | |||
04/15/2010 | House Calendar Number 354 | |||
04/15/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/15/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/29/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/29/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/12/2010 | Public Hearing 03/17 | |||
03/05/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |