04/13/2010 | File Number 497 | |||
04/13/2010 | House Calendar Number 301 | |||
04/13/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/11/2010 | Public Hearing 03/15 | |||
03/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |