|
06/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Special Act 10-8
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 590
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5697
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
File Number 614
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
House Calendar Number 372
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/20/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|