|
06/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Public Act 10-151
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 571
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5687
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
File Number 591
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
House Calendar Number 365
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|