|
05/01/2010
|
File Number 685
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the Senate
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4776
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
File Number 588
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
House Calendar Number 367
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/15
|
|
|
|
03/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|