04/23/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 469 | |||
04/23/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/21/2010 | House Passed | |||
04/21/2010 | House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 3860 | |||
04/12/2010 | File Number 461 | |||
04/12/2010 | House Calendar Number 270 | |||
04/12/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/12/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM | |||
03/25/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/24/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2010 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/12/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |