05/05/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 591 | |||
05/05/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2010 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
05/05/2010 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B | |||
05/05/2010 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5567 | |||
05/05/2010 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5622 | |||
04/13/2010 | File Number 498 | |||
04/13/2010 | House Calendar Number 303 | |||
04/13/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2010 | Public Hearing 03/19 | |||
03/12/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |