05/26/2010 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/18/2010 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/13/2010 | Public Act 10-94 | |||
05/04/2010 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |||
05/04/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/29/2010 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/29/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/29/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/29/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/29/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/22/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 454 | |||
04/20/2010 | House Passed | |||
04/15/2010 | File Number 565 | |||
04/15/2010 | House Calendar Number 355 | |||
04/15/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2010 | Public Hearing 03/26 | |||
03/15/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |