05/04/2010 | House Calendar Number 498 | |||
05/04/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/03/2010 | Transmitted Pursuant to the Joint Rules | |||
05/03/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/03/2010 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/03/2010 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4348 | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/14/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/03/2010 | File Number 1 | |||
03/03/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 35 | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/05/2010 | Public Hearing 02/11 | |||
02/03/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |