|
05/18/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Public Act 10-77
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
House Calendar Number 476
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
File Number 644
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
File Number 287
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 212
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
|
02/03/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|