04/19/2010 | Motion Failed JF | |||
04/14/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/03/2010 | File Number 2 | |||
03/03/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 36 | |||
03/03/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/03/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/25/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/17/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/16/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/05/2010 | Public Hearing 02/11 | |||
02/03/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |