|
05/18/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Public Act 10-63
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
House Calendar Number 425
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3006
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
File Number 160
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 129
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|