04/21/2010 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/30/2010 | File Number 187 | |||
03/30/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 134 | |||
03/30/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/30/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/19/2010 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |||
02/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |