|
05/26/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Public Act 10-88
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
House Calendar Number 426
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 2946
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
File Number 37
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 69
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/18
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|