04/27/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/26/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/23/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/23/2010 | File Number 80 | |||
03/23/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 93 | |||
03/16/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/09/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2010 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |||
02/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |