04/14/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/16/2010 | File Number 38 | |||
03/16/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 70 | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/16/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/15/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/04/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/04/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/10/2010 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
02/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |