04/30/2010 | House Calendar Number 458 | |||
04/30/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/29/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/29/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/21/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/21/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/16/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
04/01/2010 | File Number 236 | |||
04/01/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 179 | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/17/2010 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/08/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |