05/19/2010 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/17/2010 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
05/11/2010 | Public Act 10-47 | |||
05/01/2010 | In Concurrence | |||
05/01/2010 | House Passed | |||
04/22/2010 | House Calendar Number 382 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/21/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/21/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/07/2010 | File Number 334 | |||
04/07/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 233 | |||
04/07/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/26/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/26/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/05/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/05/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/04/2010 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | |||
02/10/2010 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
02/09/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |