03/24/2010 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/16/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
03/15/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Health | |||
02/11/2010 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |