|
06/02/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/14/2010
|
Public Act 10-98
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
House Calendar Number 480
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Immediate Transmittal to the House
|
|
|
|
05/01/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3949
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
File Number 189
|
|
|
|
03/30/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 138
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|