|
06/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Public Act 10-147
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
House Calendar Number 499
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
File Number 615
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/21/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
File Number 237
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 169
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|