|
05/05/2010
|
House Calendar Number 528
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5544
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
File Number 597
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 427
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/16
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|