|
05/18/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
Public Act 10-64
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Referred by House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Calendar Number 384
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 3729
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3544
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
No New File by Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Commerce
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
File Number 81
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 84
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|