04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/30/2010 | File Number 190 | |||
03/30/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 140 | |||
03/30/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/30/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/02/2010 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |