|
05/11/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Public Act 10-25
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Calendar Number 385
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
File Number 572
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 395
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/09/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/14/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/24/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/19/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/16/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Environment
|
|
|