04/27/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/27/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/16/2010 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/25/2010 | File Number 123 | |||
03/25/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 102 | |||
03/19/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/11/2010 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |