04/21/2010 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/21/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/20/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/16/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/11/2010 | File Number 27 | |||
03/11/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 49 | |||
03/05/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/10/10 5:00 PM | |||
02/17/2010 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |