|
06/07/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Public Act 10-115
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
House Calendar Number 430
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3898
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
File Number 469
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 332
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/26/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/12/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/10/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|