04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/14/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/01/2010 | File Number 241 | |||
04/01/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 181 | |||
03/26/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/12/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/12/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/09/2010 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | |||
02/17/2010 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/10/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |