LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00159
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00159
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2010 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00159
Action History
03/04/2010
Public Hearing 03/10
02/26/2010
Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development
02/26/2010
Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
02/25/2010
Change of Reference to Planning and Development
02/24/2010
Referred to Joint Committee on Banks
02/23/2010
Drafted by Committee
02/18/2010
Vote to Draft