03/30/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/30/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/29/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/24/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations | |||
03/05/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education | |||
03/05/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education | |||
03/04/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education | |||
02/18/2010 | Public Hearing 02/25 | |||
02/16/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |