04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/25/2010 | File Number 126 | |||
03/25/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 110 | |||
03/25/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/25/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/19/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/16/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/16/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/15/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/15/2010 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/11/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Labor and Public Employees | |||
03/01/2010 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
02/17/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |