04/21/2010 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/14/2010 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/31/2010 | File Number 231 | |||
03/31/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 158 | |||
03/31/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/31/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2010 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/17/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |