04/22/2010 | House Calendar Number 397 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/21/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/21/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
03/23/2010 | File Number 84 | |||
03/23/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 87 | |||
03/23/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/23/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/16/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/09/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/18/2010 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/17/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |