04/22/2010 | House Calendar Number 399 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/21/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/21/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/16/2010 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/16/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/15/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/15/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/25/2010 | File Number 127 | |||
03/25/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 109 | |||
03/19/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/05/2010 | Public Hearing 03/09 | |||
02/17/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |