|
06/08/2010
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2010
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Public Act 10-152
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A,B,C
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule C 5722
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule B 5565
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5561
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
House Calendar Number 401
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
File Number 292
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 217
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/29/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/10 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/17/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
02/23/2010
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/17/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|