LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00211
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00211
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2010 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00211
Action History
03/05/2010
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
03/05/2010
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
03/04/2010
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/03/2010
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/02/2010
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
02/19/2010
Public Hearing 02/25
02/18/2010
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs