|
04/22/2010
|
House Calendar Number 402
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3798
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
File Number 541
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Senate Calendar Number 387
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/10 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/05/2010
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Public Hearing 02/25
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans Affairs
|
|
|