04/22/2010 | House Calendar Number 405 | |||
04/22/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/21/2010 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/21/2010 | Senate Passed | |||
04/14/2010 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/14/2010 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2010 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2010 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/12/2010 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/08/2010 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/30/2010 | File Number 195 | |||
03/30/2010 | Senate Calendar Number 148 | |||
03/23/2010 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/10 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2010 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/23/2010 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/18/2010 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |